CA AB1706 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Senate committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Senate committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 3003 of the Government Code, and to amend Section 532b of the Penal Code, relating to military fraud.
Title
Military fraud.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-08-11 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-14 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-10 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Veterans Affairs Recommend Consent (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-14 - Assembly - AB 1706 CHAVEZ Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-04-06 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-15 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Veterans Affairs to Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-14 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-10 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Veterans Affairs Recommend Consent (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-14 - Assembly - AB 1706 CHAVEZ Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-04-06 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-15 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Veterans Affairs to Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Senate | From Senate committee without further action. |
2016-08-11 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. In committee: Held under submission. |
2016-08-08 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2016-06-14 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-05-10 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on V.A. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (May 10). Re-referred to Com. on V.A. |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on G.O. and V.A. |
2016-04-14 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2016-04-14 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 4360.) |
2016-04-07 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2016-04-06 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (April 6). |
2016-03-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (March 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-03-15 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on V.A. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 15). Re-referred to Com. on V.A. |
2016-03-09 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2016-03-08 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2016-03-01 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2016-02-18 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and V.A. |
2016-01-26 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 25. |
2016-01-25 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 3003 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 532 | Amended Code | Citation Text |