CA AB1705 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 670, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 670, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 7201 and 10261 of the Public Contract Code, relating to public contracts.
Title
Public contracts: payment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-08-18 - Assembly - AB 1705 WILLIAMS Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1705 Williams By Leno (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-10 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-05 - Assembly - AB 1705 WILLIAMS Assembly Third Reading (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-04-30 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1705 Williams By Leno (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-10 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-05 - Assembly - AB 1705 WILLIAMS Assembly Third Reading (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-04-30 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-27 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 670, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-09-27 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-08-27 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2014-08-18 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6107.). |
2014-08-14 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 16 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2014-08-14 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4501.). |
2014-08-12 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-11 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-06-10 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 10). |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2014-05-05 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2014-05-05 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 4755.) |
2014-05-01 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-04-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 30). |
2014-04-01 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on A. & A.R. |
2014-03-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on A. & A.R. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on A. & A.R. Read second time and amended. |
2014-02-14 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 16. |
2014-02-13 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Contract Code | 10261 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Contract Code | 7201 | Amended Code | Citation Text |