CA AB1705 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-10 - In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-10 - In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Sections 17131.3 and 24303 to the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation, to take effect immediately, tax levy.
Title
Income taxation: exclusion: grants for specified energy
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-10 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission. | |
2010-04-19 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2010-04-12 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to REV. & TAX. suspense file. | |
2010-03-22 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2010-03-15 | Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. | |
2010-03-11 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended. | |
2010-03-09 | Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. | |
2010-03-08 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended. | |
2010-02-11 | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. | |
2010-02-02 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 4. | |
2010-02-01 | Read first time. To print. |