CA AB1701 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 243, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 243, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act relating to state claims, making an appropriation therefor, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
State claims.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-08-18 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1701 Gonzalez By Lara Urgency Clause (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-11 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-08 - Assembly - AB 1701 GONZALEZ Third Reading Urgency (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-08-03 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-11 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-08 - Assembly - AB 1701 GONZALEZ Third Reading Urgency (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-08-03 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-08-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 243, Statutes of 2016. | |
2016-08-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2016-08-25 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m. |
2016-08-19 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2016-08-18 | Senate | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 5134.). |
2016-08-15 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-11 | Senate | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 4861.) From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 11). |
2016-08-09 | Senate | Referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-08-08 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2016-08-08 | Assembly | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 5744.). |
2016-08-04 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (August 3). |
2016-06-28 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-06-27 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. |
2016-06-23 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. |
2016-02-08 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-01-26 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 25. |
2016-01-25 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |