CA AB1699 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-18 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-18 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 12810 of the Vehicle Code, relating to vehicles.
Title
Vehicles used in commission of crimes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-18 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2022-02-03 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on TRANS. and PUB. S. |
2022-01-26 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 25. |
2022-01-25 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Vehicle Code | 12810 | Amended Code | Citation Text |