CA AB1699 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-08-31 - Re-referred to Com. on RLS. Senate Rule 29.3(b) suspended. (Ayes 23. Noes 11. Page 5072.) From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS. Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading. Read third time. Urgency clause refused adoption. (Ayes 23. Noes 10. Page 5116.)
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-08-31 - Re-referred to Com. on RLS. Senate Rule 29.3(b) suspended. (Ayes 23. Noes 11. Page 5072.) From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS. Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading. Read third time. Urgency clause refused adoption. (Ayes 23. Noes 10. Page 5116.)
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 1232 to, and to add Chapter 1.5 (commencing with Section 16330) to Part 2 of Division 4 of Title 2 of, the Government Code, and to add Section 9400.5 to the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to interim appropriations, making an appropriation therefor, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Interim appropriations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-08-31 - Senate - W/O REF. TO FILE AB1699 Hernandez Urgency Clause (Y: 23 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2010-08-12 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1699 Hernandez Lay on Table (Y: 19 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-07-15 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-23 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-03 - Assembly - AB 1699 HERNANDEZ Third Reading Urgency (Y: 54 N: 19 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-07 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-12 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1699 Hernandez Lay on Table (Y: 19 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-07-15 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-23 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-03 - Assembly - AB 1699 HERNANDEZ Third Reading Urgency (Y: 54 N: 19 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-07 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-08-31 | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. Senate Rule 29.3(b) suspended. (Ayes 23. Noes 11. Page 5072.) From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS. Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading. Read third time. Urgency clause refused adoption. (Ayes 23. Noes 10. Page 5116.) | |
2010-08-18 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2010-08-17 | Read third time, amended. To second reading. | |
2010-08-02 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2010-07-15 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (July 15). | |
2010-06-24 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 23). | |
2010-06-10 | Referred to Com. on P.E. & R. | |
2010-06-07 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2010-06-03 | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed and to Senate. (Ayes 54. Noes 19. Page 5569.) | |
2010-05-28 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 28). Read second time. To third reading. | |
2010-04-21 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2010-04-07 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (April 7). | |
2010-02-11 | Referred to Com. on P.E.,R. & S.S. | |
2010-02-02 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 4. | |
2010-02-01 | Read first time. To print. |