CA AB1697 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-30 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Assembly Member Grayson.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 1946.2 to the Civil Code, relating to housing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Housing: tenancy termination: just cause.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-30AssemblyOrdered to inactive file at the request of Assembly Member Grayson.
2019-05-02AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-05-01AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2019-04-30AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (April 30).
2019-03-26AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on JUD.
2019-03-25AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
2019-03-25AssemblyReferred to Com. on JUD.
2019-02-25AssemblyRead first time.
2019-02-23AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
2019-02-22AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Civil Code1946.2New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback