CA AB1697 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-06-08 - Referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
Pending: Senate Labor and Industrial Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 139.8 to the Labor Code, relating to workers’ compensation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Workers’ compensation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-30 - Assembly - AB 1697 INS. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-08SenateReferred to Com. on L. & I.R.
2017-05-30SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2017-05-30AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1859.)
2017-05-25AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2017-05-24AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 24).
2017-04-20AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-04-17AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on INS.
2017-04-06AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on INS. Read second time and amended.
2017-03-16AssemblyReferred to Com. on INS.
2017-02-28AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 30.
2017-02-27AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Labor Code139.8New CodeSee Bill Text
Labor Code3720.1Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback