CA AB1697 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 2 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-10 - Referred to Com. on JUD.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 2 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-10 - Referred to Com. on JUD.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 68085 of the Government Code, and to amend Section 1465.8 of the Penal Code, relating to courts.
Title
Court security.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-06-02 - Assembly - AB 1697 HALL Assembly Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 18 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended. (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended. (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-10 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | |
2010-06-03 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2010-06-02 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 56. Noes 18. Page 5494.) | |
2010-06-01 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2010-05-28 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 28). Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. | |
2010-04-28 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2010-04-20 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 20). | |
2010-04-19 | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | |
2010-04-15 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. | |
2010-04-13 | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | |
2010-04-12 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. | |
2010-02-11 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | |
2010-02-02 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 4. | |
2010-02-01 | Read first time. To print. |