CA AB1691 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 26 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-31 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Leyva.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 26 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-31 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Leyva.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 45500 and 88280 of the Education Code, relating to education finance.
Title
Education finance: Classified School and Community College Employee Summer Assistance Programs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-08-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-27 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-13 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-26 - Assembly - AB 1691 Medina Assembly Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-16 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Higher Education] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-27 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-13 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-26 - Assembly - AB 1691 Medina Assembly Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-16 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Higher Education] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-31 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Leyva. |
2022-08-15 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-11 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2022-08-11 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 11). |
2022-06-27 | Senate | In committee: Referred to suspense file. |
2022-06-14 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-08 | Senate | Referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R. |
2022-05-27 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2022-05-26 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 55. Noes 11.) |
2022-05-23 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 19). |
2022-05-11 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file. |
2022-04-25 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-04-21 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2022-04-20 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (April 19). |
2022-03-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (March 16). Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2022-03-16 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2022-03-15 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R. |
2022-03-11 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P.E. & R. Read second time and amended. |
2022-02-03 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on P.E. & R. and HIGHER ED. |
2022-01-25 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 24. |
2022-01-24 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 45500 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 88280 | New Code | See Bill Text |