CA AB1677 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-23 - In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-23 - In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Article 2 (commencing with Section 70130) of Chapter 3 of Part 42 of Division 5 of Title 3 of the Education Code, relating to nursing education, and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Nursing education: service in public hospitals and veterans' facilities.
Sponsors
Asm. Jimmy Gomez [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-04-01 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-23 | Assembly | In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission. |
2014-04-09 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2014-04-02 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-03-18 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2014-03-17 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended. |
2014-02-27 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2014-02-13 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 15. |
2014-02-12 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 70130 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |