CA AB1670 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Sections 17053.80 and 23680 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation, to take effect immediately, tax levy.
Title
Income taxes: credits: qualified developer: affordable housing.
Sponsors
Asm. Jimmy Gomez [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Revenue and Taxation] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-01 | Assembly | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2018-01-31 | Assembly | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2017-05-08 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-04-27 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2017-04-19 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-04-19 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2017-04-18 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended. |
2017-03-29 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2017-03-28 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended. |
2017-03-27 | Assembly | Re-referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and REV. & TAX. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2017-03-27 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on REV. & TAX. and H. & C.D. |
2017-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2017-02-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Revenue and Taxation Code | 17053.80 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 23680 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |