CA AB1669 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 736, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 736, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 27205, 27210, 27220, 27225, 27235, 27240, 27305, 27310, 27315, 27320, 27340, 27345, 28225, 28235, and 28240 of, and to add Section 28233 to, the Penal Code, relating to firearms.
Title
Firearms: gun shows and events.
Sponsors
Asm. Rob Bonta [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-09-10 - Assembly - AB 1669 Bonta Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 49 N: 23 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-09 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1669 Bonta By Jackson (Y: 27 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Senate - Result (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-19 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - Assembly - AB 1669 Bonta Assembly Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 22 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-24 - Assembly - AB 1669 Bonta Assembly Third Reading Amend By BONTA Set #1 (Y: 51 N: 18 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-09 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1669 Bonta By Jackson (Y: 27 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Senate - Result (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-19 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - Assembly - AB 1669 Bonta Assembly Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 22 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-24 - Assembly - AB 1669 Bonta Assembly Third Reading Amend By BONTA Set #1 (Y: 51 N: 18 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-11 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 736, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-10-11 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-09-23 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2019-09-10 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 49. Noes 23. Page 3286.). |
2019-09-10 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 3252.) |
2019-09-09 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 11 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2019-09-09 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 27. Noes 11. Page 2675.). |
2019-08-30 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-30 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 30). |
2019-08-19 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-08-12 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2019-07-09 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (July 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-06-24 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2019-06-20 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2019-05-29 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-28 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 49. Noes 22. Page 2008.) |
2019-05-24 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 51. Noes 18. Page 1983.) |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 1720.) |
2019-04-25 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-04-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 5.) (April 24). |
2019-04-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-04 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2019-04-03 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2019-03-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2019-02-25 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2019-02-23 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. |
2019-02-22 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 27205 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 27210 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 27220 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 27225 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 27235 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 27240 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 27305 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 27310 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 27315 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 27320 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 27340 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 27345 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 28225 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 28233 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 28235 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 28240 | Amended Code | Citation Text |