CA AB1665 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Vetoed on September 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-30 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-30 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 9880.1 of, and to add Section 9884.75 to, the Business and Professions Code, relating to automotive repair.
Title
Automotive repair.
Sponsors
Sen. Brian Jones [R] | Asm. Kevin Mullin [D] | Sen. Ted Lieu [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-08-20 - Assembly - AB 1665 JONES Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 75 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-08-18 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1665 Jones By Lieu (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-04 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-28 - Assembly - AB 1665 JONES Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-18 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1665 Jones By Lieu (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-04 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-28 - Assembly - AB 1665 JONES Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-30 | Vetoed by Governor. | |
2014-09-03 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2014-08-20 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 75. Noes 2. Page 6213.). |
2014-08-18 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 20 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2014-08-18 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4555.). |
2014-08-06 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-05 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 4). |
2014-06-26 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 23). |
2014-06-05 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2014-05-28 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2014-05-28 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 1. Page 5245.) |
2014-05-27 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-05-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 23). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2014-05-07 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2014-04-28 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-04-24 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2014-04-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 22). |
2014-03-24 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. |
2014-03-20 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. Read second time and amended. |
2014-02-13 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 15. |
2014-02-12 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 7525 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 9880.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 9884.75 | New Code | See Bill Text |