CA AB1654 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 222, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 222, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 67382 of the Education Code, relating to student safety.
Title
Student safety: crime reporting.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-08-11 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB1654 Santiago (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-15 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-01 - Assembly - AB 1654 SANTIAGO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations to Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-15 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-01 - Assembly - AB 1654 SANTIAGO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations to Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-08-29 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 222, Statutes of 2016. | |
2016-08-29 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2016-08-15 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2016-08-11 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2016-08-11 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4872.). |
2016-08-02 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2016-08-01 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2016-06-15 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-06-09 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2016-06-02 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2016-06-01 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 5087.) |
2016-05-31 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-05-27 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (May 27). Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2016-04-06 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2016-03-16 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-03-15 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. |
2016-03-01 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-02-23 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2016-02-22 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2016-02-04 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2016-01-14 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 13. |
2016-01-13 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 67382 | Amended Code | Citation Text |