CA AB1649 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-19 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-19 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 10225.5 and 10227.5 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to childcare.
Title
Childcare services: alternative payment programs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-19 | Assembly | In committee: Held under submission. |
2022-04-06 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file. |
2022-03-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (March 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-01-20 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2022-01-14 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 13. |
2022-01-13 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 10225.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 10227.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |