CA AB1648 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-20 - Re-referred to Com. on W., P., & W.
Pending: Assembly Water, Parks and Wildlife Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-20 - Re-referred to Com. on W., P., & W.
Pending: Assembly Water, Parks and Wildlife Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 12566 to the Water Code, relating to water.
Title
Water: Colorado River conservation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-20 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on W., P., & W. |
2023-03-16 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W., P., & W. Read second time and amended. |
2023-03-16 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on W., P., & W. |
2023-02-18 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. |
2023-02-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Water Code | 12566 | New Code | See Bill Text |