CA AB1639 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 20 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-06-14 - Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 13956 of the Government Code, relating to crime victims.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Crime victims: the California Victim Compensation Board.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-13 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - Assembly - AB 1639 GARCIA, E. Assembly Third Reading (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-14SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-06-13SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 13).
2017-06-01SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2017-05-10SenateReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2017-04-20SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2017-04-20AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 66. Noes 0. Page 1135.)
2017-04-17AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-04-06AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2017-04-05AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 4).
2017-03-16AssemblyReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2017-02-19AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
2017-02-17AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code13956Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback