CA AB162 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-08-31 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Roth.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-08-31 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Roth.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 21655.4 to the Vehicle Code, relating to transportation.
Title
High-occupancy vehicle lanes: County of Riverside.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-07-02 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-15 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - Assembly - AB 162 CERVANTES Assembly Third Reading (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on No Votes Recorded: (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Jobs, Economic Development, and the Economy] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-15 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - Assembly - AB 162 CERVANTES Assembly Third Reading (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on No Votes Recorded: (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Jobs, Economic Development, and the Economy] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-31 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Roth. |
2018-08-06 | Senate | Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-01 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2018-07-03 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-07-02 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 2). |
2018-06-25 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2018-05-15 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (May 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-05-08 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2018-04-09 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2017-06-26 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2017-05-30 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-05-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1807.) |
2017-05-26 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 26). |
2017-05-10 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2017-05-03 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-05-02 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2017-05-01 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 25). |
2017-04-17 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2017-03-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on J., E.D., & E. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (March 27). Re-referred to Com. on J., E.D., & E. |
2017-03-28 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2017-03-20 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2017-03-13 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-03-06 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2017-03-01 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2017-02-28 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended. |
2017-02-27 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on REV. & TAX. and J., E.D., & E. |
2017-01-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 16. |
2017-01-13 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Revenue and Taxation Code | 17059.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 23689 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 21655.4 | New Code | See Bill Text |