CA AB1592 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 814, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 814, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Section 38755 of the Vehicle Code, relating to autonomous vehicles.
Title
Autonomous vehicles: pilot project.
Sponsors
Asm. Susan Bonilla [D] | Asm. Travis Allen [R] | Asm. Catharine Baker [R] | Asm. Adrin Nazarian [D] |
Asm. Jay Obernolte [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-08-29 - Assembly - AB 1592 BONILLA Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 75 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-08-23 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1592 Bonilla By Cannella (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-07 - Assembly - AB 1592 BONILLA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-04-04 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-23 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1592 Bonilla By Cannella (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-07 - Assembly - AB 1592 BONILLA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-04-04 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-29 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 814, Statutes of 2016. | |
2016-09-29 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2016-09-02 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12 p.m. |
2016-08-29 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 75. Noes 3. Page 6338.). |
2016-08-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 26 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2016-08-23 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5289.). |
2016-08-22 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-19 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2016-08-16 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-15 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2016-08-02 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-01 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and be amended. |
2016-06-23 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5. |
2016-06-22 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-06-21 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 14). |
2016-06-06 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2016-04-07 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2016-04-07 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 4229.) |
2016-04-06 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-04-05 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 4). |
2016-03-29 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2016-03-28 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. |
2016-03-10 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2016-02-01 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2016-01-07 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 6. |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Vehicle Code | 38755 | New Code | See Bill Text |