CA AB1584 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-02 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 397, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-02 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 397, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Article 13 (commencing with Section 397) to, and to repeal the heading of Article 13 (commencing with Section 397) of, Chapter 2.3 of Part 1 of Division 1 of the Public Utilities Code, relating to electricity.
Title
Electricity: cost allocation.
Sponsors
Asm. Bill Quirk [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-09-10 - Assembly - AB 1584 Quirk Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-06 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1584 Quirk By Hertzberg (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-02 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Assembly - AB 1584 Quirk Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-06 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1584 Quirk By Hertzberg (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-02 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Assembly - AB 1584 Quirk Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-02 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 397, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-10-02 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-09-23 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2019-09-10 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3247.). |
2019-09-06 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 8 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2019-09-06 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 2607.). |
2019-08-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-19 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2019-08-13 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-08-12 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 2). |
2019-06-25 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C. |
2019-06-11 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E., U. & C. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1781.) |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-15 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 15). |
2019-05-13 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1609.) |
2019-05-08 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2019-05-02 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-05-01 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2019-04-30 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 24). |
2019-03-26 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on U. & E. |
2019-03-25 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & E. Read second time and amended. |
2019-03-14 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on U. & E. |
2019-02-25 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2019-02-23 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. |
2019-02-22 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities Code | 397 | New Code | See Bill Text |