CA AB158 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2022-02-16 - From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R.
Pending: Senate Budget and Fiscal Review Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act relating to the Budget Act of 2022.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Budget Act of 2022.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-28 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Assembly - AB 158 BUDGET Assembly Third Reading By TING (Y: 56 N: 18 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-02-16SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R.
2021-08-16SenateRe-referred to Com. on B. & F.R.
2021-06-28SenateOrdered to third reading.
2021-06-28SenateSenate Rule 29 suspended. (Ayes 31. Noes 9.)
2021-06-28SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 3. Page 1691.) (June 28).
2021-06-25SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R.
2021-06-24SenateJoint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Ayes 29. Noes 9.)
2021-03-11SenateReferred to Com. on B. & F.R.
2021-02-25SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2021-02-25AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 56. Noes 18. Page 490.)
2021-02-23AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-02-22AssemblyOrdered to second reading.
2021-02-22AssemblyWithdrawn from committee.
2021-02-22AssemblyAssembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 17. Page 432.)
2021-02-22AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on BUDGET.
2021-02-18AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on BUDGET. Read second time and amended.
2021-01-28AssemblyReferred to Com. on BUDGET.
2021-01-11AssemblyRead first time.
2021-01-09AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee February 9.
2021-01-08AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code6103.10New CodeSee Bill Text
Health and Safety Code25110.3New CodeSee Bill Text
Health and Safety Code25144.6Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code25150.84Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code25174.1Repealed CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code25174.2Repealed CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code25174.6Repealed CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code25174.7Repealed CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code25178.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code25200Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code25200.2Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code25200.3Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code25201.4.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code25201.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code25201.6Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code25204.7Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code25205Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code25205.12Repealed CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code25205.14Repealed CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code25205.15Repealed CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code25205.21Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code25205.3Repealed CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code25205.4Repealed CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code25218.6Repealed CodeCitation Text
Revenue and Taxation Code43002.3New CodeSee Bill Text
Revenue and Taxation Code43012New CodeSee Bill Text
Revenue and Taxation Code43051Repealed CodeCitation Text
Revenue and Taxation Code43053Amended CodeCitation Text
Revenue and Taxation Code43054Amended CodeCitation Text
Revenue and Taxation Code43101Amended CodeCitation Text
Revenue and Taxation Code43151Repealed CodeCitation Text
Revenue and Taxation Code43152Amended CodeCitation Text
Revenue and Taxation Code43152.12Repealed CodeCitation Text
Revenue and Taxation Code43152.15Repealed CodeCitation Text
Revenue and Taxation Code43152.6New CodeSee Bill Text
Revenue and Taxation Code43152.7New CodeSee Bill Text
Revenue and Taxation Code43152.8Amended CodeCitation Text
Revenue and Taxation Code43152.9Amended CodeCitation Text
Revenue and Taxation Code43160Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback