CA AB1579 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on September 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-22 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 213, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on September 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-22 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 213, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 3044 and 3201 of the Family Code, relating to family law.
Title
Family law omnibus.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-09-01 - Assembly - AB 1579 JUD. Concurrence in Senate Amendments By STONE (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1579 JUD. (Stone) By Umberg (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Assembly - AB 1579 JUD. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1579 JUD. (Stone) By Umberg (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Assembly - AB 1579 JUD. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-22 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 213, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-09-22 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2021-09-09 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2021-09-01 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2622.). |
2021-08-26 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 28 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2021-08-26 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 2114.). |
2021-06-28 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Ordered to third reading. |
2021-06-10 | Senate | From Consent Calendar. |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2021-06-08 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 8). |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2021-04-19 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1071.) |
2021-04-14 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2021-04-13 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 13). |
2021-03-11 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2021-03-09 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee April 8. |
2021-03-08 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Family Code | 3044 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Family Code | 3201 | Amended Code | Citation Text |