CA AB1573 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-23 - In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-23 - In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 52052 of, and to add Article 5 (commencing with Section 52078) to Chapter 6.1 of Part 28 of Division 4 of Title 2 of, the Education Code, relating to alternative schools.
Title
Alternative schools: Student Achievement via Excellence accountability system.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-30 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-23 | Assembly | In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission. |
2014-05-14 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2014-05-05 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-05-01 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. |
2014-04-03 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2014-04-02 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. |
2014-02-06 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2014-01-31 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 2. |
2014-01-30 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 46201 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 46300.8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 52052 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 52078 | New Code | See Bill Text |