CA AB1561 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-01-14 - Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on October 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-01-14 - Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 6325 of, and to add Section 6333 to, the Labor Code, relating to employment.
Title
Occupational safety and health: citation outcome
Sponsors
Asm. Mike Eng [D] | Asm. Warren Furutani [D] | Asm. Fiona Ma [D] | Sen. William Monning [D] |
Sen. Anthony Portantino [D] |
Roll Calls
2009-09-03 - Assembly - AB 1561 L.& E. Concurrence in Senate Amendments By SWANSON (Y: 49 N: 29 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-09-01 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1561 Committee on L. & E. (Monning) By Leno (Y: 25 N: 13 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-08-17 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-07-08 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-01 - Assembly - AB 1561 L.& E. Assembly Third Reading By SWANSON (Y: 49 N: 30 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-09-01 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1561 Committee on L. & E. (Monning) By Leno (Y: 25 N: 13 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-08-17 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-07-08 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-01 - Assembly - AB 1561 L.& E. Assembly Third Reading By SWANSON (Y: 49 N: 30 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-01-14 | Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file. | |
2009-10-26 | Consideration of Governor's veto pending. | |
2009-10-11 | Vetoed by Governor. | |
2009-09-11 | Enrolled and to the Governor at 7 p.m. | |
2009-09-03 | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 2970.) Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 49. Noes 29. Page 2998.) | |
2009-09-02 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 4 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. | |
2009-09-01 | Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 25. Noes 13. Page 2067.) | |
2009-08-19 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2009-08-18 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 3.) (August 17). | |
2009-07-09 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (July 8). | |
2009-07-02 | Re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R. | |
2009-06-26 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2009-06-11 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2009-06-02 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2009-06-01 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 49. Noes 30. Page 1857.) | |
2009-05-29 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 28). Read second time. To third reading. | |
2009-05-06 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2009-04-23 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 22). | |
2009-04-02 | Referred to Com. on L. & E. | |
2009-03-12 | From printer. May be heard in committee April 11. | |
2009-03-11 | Read first time. To print. |