CA AB1560 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 15 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-08-30 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Monning.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 15 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-08-30 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Monning.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 2746.51, 2836.1, 3516, and 3516.5 of, and to add Sections 2746.54 and 2836.4 to, the Business and Professions Code, relating to healing arts.
Title
Nurse practitioners: certified nurse-midwives: physician assistants: physician and surgeon supervision.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-07-10 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Assembly - AB 1560 FRIEDMAN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Assembly - AB 1560 FRIEDMAN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-30 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Monning. |
2018-08-24 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-23 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2018-08-23 | Senate | From inactive file. |
2017-09-07 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Hill. |
2017-07-12 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-07-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (July 10). |
2017-07-03 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2017-05-15 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-05-15 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 1529.) |
2017-05-09 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-08 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2017-05-04 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (May 2). |
2017-03-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2017-03-21 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended. |
2017-03-20 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2017-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2017-02-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 2746.51 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 2746.54 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Business and Professions Code | 2836.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 2836.4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Business and Professions Code | 3516 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 3516.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 500 | Amended Code | Citation Text |