CA AB1555 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act relating to greenhouse gases, and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Greenhouse Gas Reduction Fund.
Sponsors
Asm. Jimmy Gomez [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Assembly | From committee without further action. |
2016-04-14 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2016-03-29 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2016-03-28 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended. |
2016-03-17 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2016-01-05 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 4. |
2016-01-04 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |