CA AB1545 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-21 - From committee without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-21 - From committee without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 27570 of, to amend, repeal, and add Section 28000 of, and to add and repeal Section 27965 of, the Penal Code, relating to firearms.
Title
Firearms: ownership.
Sponsors
Asm. Adam Gray [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 2 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-21 | Assembly | From committee without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). |
2014-04-22 | Assembly | In committee: Set, second hearing. Failed passage. |
2014-04-10 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2014-04-09 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2014-04-01 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2014-03-04 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2014-03-03 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2014-01-30 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2014-01-24 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 23. |
2014-01-23 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 11106 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 27570 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 27965 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 28000 | Amended Code | Citation Text |