CA AB1542 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 668, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 668, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 667.95 to the Penal Code, relating to violent felonies.
Title
Violent felonies: video recording.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-09-13 - Assembly - AB 1542 DABABNEH Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-11 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1542 Dababneh et al. By Wiener (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-01 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-21 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-11 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Assembly - AB 1542 DABABNEH Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-11 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1542 Dababneh et al. By Wiener (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-01 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-21 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-11 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Assembly - AB 1542 DABABNEH Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-11 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 668, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-10-11 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-09-21 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2017-09-13 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3305.). |
2017-09-13 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77(a) suspended. (Page 3254.) |
2017-09-12 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 14 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2017-09-11 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2694.). |
2017-09-05 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-09-01 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2017-09-01 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (September 1). |
2017-08-21 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2017-07-12 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (July 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2017-06-01 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-05-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 1. Page 1921.) |
2017-05-30 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 1.) (May 26). |
2017-05-17 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2017-05-02 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-05-01 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2017-04-27 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (April 25). |
2017-04-18 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-03-16 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2017-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2017-02-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 667.95 | New Code | See Bill Text |