CA AB154 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Failed on February 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-03 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Failed on February 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-03 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 66027.9 to the Education Code, relating to public postsecondary education.
Title
Public postsecondary education: income share agreement: pilot program.
Sponsors
Asm. Randy Voepel [R] | Asm. Tom Lackey [R] | Asm. Devon Mathis [R] | Sen. Anthony Portantino [D] |
Asm. Marie Waldron [R] | Sen. Scott Wilk [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-19 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-03 | Assembly | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2020-01-31 | Assembly | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | In committee: Held under submission. |
2019-04-03 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-03-25 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-03-21 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2019-03-20 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (March 19). |
2019-01-24 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2019-01-08 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 7. |
2019-01-07 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 66027.9 | New Code | See Bill Text |