CA AB154 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-12 - Stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-12 - Stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1203.096 of the Penal Code, relating to prisoners.
Title
Prisoners: mental health treatment.
Sponsors
Asm. Marc Levine [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-09-05 - Assembly - AB 154 LEVINE Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-31 - Senate - Special Consent Calendar # AB154 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Assembly - AB 154 LEVINE Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-31 - Senate - Special Consent Calendar # AB154 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Assembly - AB 154 LEVINE Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-12 | Stricken from file. | |
2018-01-03 | Consideration of Governor's veto pending. | |
2017-09-25 | Vetoed by Governor. | |
2017-09-12 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m. |
2017-09-05 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2912.). |
2017-08-31 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 2 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2017-08-31 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2350.). |
2017-08-23 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2017-07-13 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-07-12 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 11). |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2017-06-01 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-05-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1951.) |
2017-05-30 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-30 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 52. Noes 24. Page 1776.) |
2017-05-30 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2017-05-26 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 26). |
2017-04-05 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2017-03-01 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (February 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-02-13 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2017-01-30 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2017-01-12 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 11. |
2017-01-11 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 1203.096 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 1425 | New Code | See Bill Text |