CA AB1537 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on August 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-12 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 191, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on August 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-12 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 191, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 63089.97 and 63089.98 of the Government Code, relating to business, and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Small Business Financial Assistance Act of 2013: reports.
Sponsors
Asm. Eduardo Garcia [D] | Asm. Young Kim [R] | Asm. Travis Allen [R] | Asm. William Brough [R] |
Asm. Cheryl Brown [D] | Asm. Edwin Chau [D] | Asm. Kansen Chu [D] | Asm. Jacqui Irwin [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-07-16 - Assembly - AB 1537 J., E.D.& E. Concurrence in Senate Amendments By GARCIA, E (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-07-09 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB1537 Committee on Jobs, Eco nomic Development, an (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-15 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-18 - Assembly - AB 1537 J., E.D.& E. Assembly Third Reading By GARCIA, E (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-05-13 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations to Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-07-09 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB1537 Committee on Jobs, Eco nomic Development, an (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-15 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-18 - Assembly - AB 1537 J., E.D.& E. Assembly Third Reading By GARCIA, E (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-05-13 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations to Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-08-12 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 191, Statutes of 2015. | |
2015-08-12 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2015-08-03 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2015-07-16 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 2409.). |
2015-07-09 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after July 11 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2015-07-09 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1880.). |
2015-07-07 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2015-07-06 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2015-06-25 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-06-24 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2015-06-15 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2015-05-18 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2015-05-18 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1488.) |
2015-05-14 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-05-13 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 13). |
2015-04-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-04-20 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on J., E.D., & E. |
2015-03-26 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee April 25. |
2015-03-25 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 63089.97 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 63089.98 | Amended Code | Citation Text |