CA AB1535 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on October 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 731, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on October 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 731, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 103, 3106, 4108, 9602, 10404, 10505, and 11303 of the Elections Code, relating to elections.
Title
Elections.
Sponsors
Asm. Sebastian Ridley-Thomas [D] | Asm. Mike Gatto [D] | Asm. Richard Gordon [D] | Asm. Kevin Mullin [D] |
Asm. Henry Perea [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-09-10 - Assembly - AB 1535 E.& R. Concurrence in Senate Amendments By RIDLEY-THOMAS (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-09 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1535 Committee On E.&R.(Ridley-Thomas) By Allen (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-07 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-22 - Assembly - AB 1535 E.& R. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-05-13 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-09 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1535 Committee On E.&R.(Ridley-Thomas) By Allen (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-07 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-22 - Assembly - AB 1535 E.& R. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-05-13 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-10 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 731, Statutes of 2015. | |
2015-10-10 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2015-09-18 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2015-09-10 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 3085.). |
2015-09-09 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2015-09-09 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2612.). |
2015-07-13 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-07-09 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (July 7). |
2015-06-30 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2015-06-24 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2015-05-22 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2015-05-22 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 1560.) |
2015-05-14 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2015-05-13 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 13). |
2015-04-06 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on E. & R. |
2015-03-26 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee April 25. |
2015-03-25 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Elections Code | 103 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 10404 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 10505 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 11303 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 3106 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 4108 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 9602 | Amended Code | Citation Text |