CA AB1531 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-05 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 248, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 411.20.5 to the Code of Civil Procedure, and to amend Section 6159 of the Government Code, relating to court fees.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Court fees: electronic filing.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-20 - Assembly - AB 1531 BERMAN Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-13 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB1531 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - Assembly - AB 1531 BERMAN Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-09 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-03 - Assembly - Be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-05 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 248, Statutes of 2018.
2018-09-05 Approved by the Governor.
2018-08-24AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
2018-08-20AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6350.).
2018-08-14AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 16 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2018-08-13SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 5280.).
2018-08-07SenateRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2018-08-06SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar.
2018-07-02SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-28SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 26).
2018-06-18SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2018-06-06SenateIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2018-04-19SenateReferred to Com. on JUD.
2018-01-29SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2018-01-29AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 3868.)
2018-01-22AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2018-01-18AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (January 18).
2018-01-11AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-01-10AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2018-01-09AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (January 9).
2018-01-03AssemblyFrom committee: Be re-referred to Com. on JUD. Re-referred. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (January 3). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2017-09-15AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
2017-09-14AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on U. & E.
2017-09-13AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & E. Read second time and amended.
2017-04-19AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2017-04-17Assembly(pending re-refer to Com. on L. GOV.)
2017-04-17AssemblyAssembly Rule 56 suspended. (Page 1005.)
2017-03-29AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on U. & E.
2017-03-28AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & E. Read second time and amended.
2017-03-27AssemblyReferred to Coms. on U. & E. and L. GOV.
2017-02-19AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
2017-02-17AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Code of Civil Procedure411.20.5New CodeSee Bill Text
Government Code6159Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code2830Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code740.2Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback