CA AB1525 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 19 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-19 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 450, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 19 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-19 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 450, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 400.1 of the Family Code, relating to marriage.
Title
Marriage: solemnization.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-08-19 - Assembly - AB 1525 LOWENTHAL Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 74 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-08-18 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1525 Lowenthal By Lara (Y: 28 N: 8 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-10 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-28 - Assembly - AB 1525 LOWENTHAL Assembly Third Reading (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2014-03-25 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-18 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1525 Lowenthal By Lara (Y: 28 N: 8 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-10 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-28 - Assembly - AB 1525 LOWENTHAL Assembly Third Reading (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2014-03-25 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-19 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 450, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-09-19 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-09-02 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2014-08-19 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6181.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 74. Noes 1. Page 6183.). |
2014-08-18 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 20 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2014-08-18 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 28. Noes 8. Page 4562.). |
2014-08-14 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-13 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2014-06-16 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-06-15 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 10). |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2014-03-28 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2014-03-28 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 64. Noes 0. Page 4239.) |
2014-03-26 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-03-25 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (March 25). |
2014-01-30 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2014-01-21 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 20. |
2014-01-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Family Code | 400 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Family Code | 400.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |