CA AB1517 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2015 - 50% progression
Action: 2015-06-30 - Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 17511.1 of the Business and Professions Code, to amend Sections 1632.5, 1748.13, 1789.12, 1812.201, and 2923.3 of the Civil Code, to amend Sections 1101.1, 2207, 2510, 3100, 17713.12, 25003, 25018, 25100, 25207, 25243.5, 25247, 25254, 25401, 25604, 25607, 25612.5, 25614, 25702, 29542, 31408, 31503, and 31513 of the Corporations Code, to amend Sections 620, 622, 1070, 2105, 4057, 12104, 17210.2, 17214, 17311, 17320, 17331, 18405, 22105.1, 22159.5, 22160, 22756, 23070, 23071, 23072, 23073, 23074, 23102, 30217, 50140, 50303, 50307.1, and 50316.5 of, to amend the heading of Article 4 (commencing with Section 670) of Chapter 7 of Division 1 of, and to repeal Section 1008 of, the Financial Code, to amend Sections 5970, 6254.5, 6254.12, 6254.22, 11840, 53344.1, 53638, and 54956.87 of the Government Code, to amend Sections 1280.7, 12693.35, 14053, and 15036 of the Insurance Code, to amend Section 4600.5 of the Labor Code, to amend Section 11604.5 of the Probate Code, to amend Section 408 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, and to amend Section 22005.1 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to business.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Business.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-06-17 - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-14 - AB 1517 B.& F. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-05-06 - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-27 - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations to Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-30SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2015-06-29SenateFrom committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2015-06-17SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2015-06-01SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.I.
2015-05-28SenateReferred to Com. on B. & F.I.
2015-05-14SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2015-05-14AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1451.)
2015-05-07AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2015-05-06AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 6).
2015-04-28AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2015-04-20AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on B. & F. In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. Measure version as amended on April 16 corrected.
2015-04-16AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & F. Read second time and amended.
2015-04-13AssemblyIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2015-04-09AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on B. & F.
2015-04-08AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & F. Read second time and amended.
2015-04-08AssemblyIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2015-03-26AssemblyReferred to Com. on B. & F.
2015-03-11AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee April 10.
2015-03-10AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Business and Professions Code17511.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Civil Code1632.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Civil Code1748.13Amended CodeCitation Text
Civil Code1789.12Amended CodeCitation Text
Civil Code1812.201Amended CodeCitation Text
Civil Code2923.3Amended CodeCitation Text
Corporations Code1101.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Corporations Code17713.12Amended CodeCitation Text
Corporations Code2207Amended CodeCitation Text
Corporations Code25003Amended CodeCitation Text
Corporations Code25018Amended CodeCitation Text
Corporations Code2510Amended CodeCitation Text
Corporations Code25100Amended CodeCitation Text
Corporations Code25207Amended CodeCitation Text
Corporations Code25243.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Corporations Code25247Amended CodeCitation Text
Corporations Code25254Amended CodeCitation Text
Corporations Code25401Amended CodeCitation Text
Corporations Code25604Amended CodeCitation Text
Corporations Code25607Amended CodeCitation Text
Corporations Code25612.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Corporations Code25614Amended CodeCitation Text
Corporations Code25702Amended CodeCitation Text
Corporations Code29542Amended CodeCitation Text
Corporations Code3100Amended CodeCitation Text
Corporations Code31408Amended CodeCitation Text
Corporations Code31503Amended CodeCitation Text
Corporations Code31513Amended CodeCitation Text
Financial Code1008Repealed CodeCitation Text
Financial Code1070Amended CodeCitation Text
Financial Code12104Amended CodeCitation Text
Financial Code17210.2Amended CodeCitation Text
Financial Code17214Amended CodeCitation Text
Financial Code17311Amended CodeCitation Text
Financial Code17320Amended CodeCitation Text
Financial Code17331Amended CodeCitation Text
Financial Code18405Amended CodeCitation Text
Financial Code2105Amended CodeCitation Text
Financial Code22105.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Financial Code22159.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Financial Code22160Amended CodeCitation Text
Financial Code22756Amended CodeCitation Text
Financial Code23070Amended CodeCitation Text
Financial Code23071Amended CodeCitation Text
Financial Code23072Amended CodeCitation Text
Financial Code23073Amended CodeCitation Text
Financial Code23074Amended CodeCitation Text
Financial Code23102Amended CodeCitation Text
Financial Code30217Amended CodeCitation Text
Financial Code4057Amended CodeCitation Text
Financial Code50140Amended CodeCitation Text
Financial Code50303Amended CodeCitation Text
Financial Code50307.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Financial Code50316.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Financial Code620Amended CodeCitation Text
Financial Code622Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code11840Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code53344.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code53638Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code54956.87Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code5970Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code6254.12Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code6254.22Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code6254.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code1341.10Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code1341.11Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code1341.12Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code1341.14Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code1341.9Repealed CodeCitation Text
Insurance Code12693.35Amended CodeCitation Text
Insurance Code1280.7Amended CodeCitation Text
Insurance Code14053Amended CodeCitation Text
Insurance Code15036Amended CodeCitation Text
Labor Code4600.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Probate Code11604.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Revenue and Taxation Code408Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code22005.1Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=ab_1517&sess=1516&house=A
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_1501-1550/ab_1517_bill_20150310_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_1501-1550/ab_1517_bill_20150408_amended_asm_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_1501-1550/ab_1517_bill_20150416_amended_asm_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_1501-1550/ab_1517_bill_20150601_amended_sen_v96.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_1501-1550/ab_1517_vote_20150427_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_1501-1550/ab_1517_vote_20150506_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_1501-1550/ab_1517_vote_20150514_1112AM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_1501-1550/ab_1517_vote_20150617_000001_sen_comm.html

Bill Comments

feedback