CA AB1502 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 570, Statutes of 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 570, Statutes of 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 17801 of the Business and Professions Code, to amend Section 731 of the Code of Civil Procedure, to amend Section 11571 of the Health and Safety Code, and to amend Section 11226 of the Penal Code, relating to nuisance.
Title
Nuisance abatement: civil action.
Sponsors
Asm. Mike Eng [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-08-16 - Assembly - AB 1502 ENG Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-10 - Assembly - Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-07-01 - Senate - Special Consent #29 AB1502 Eng (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-10 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-27 - Assembly - AB 1502 ENG Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-21 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-11 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-10 - Assembly - Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-07-01 - Senate - Special Consent #29 AB1502 Eng (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-10 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-27 - Assembly - AB 1502 ENG Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-21 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-11 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-09-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 570, Statutes of 2010. | |
2010-09-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2010-08-26 | Enrolled and to the Governor at 3 p.m. | |
2010-08-16 | Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 6215.) | |
2010-08-10 | From committee: With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (August 10). | |
2010-08-05 | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. | |
2010-08-02 | Re-referred to Coms. on JUD. and APPR. pursuant to Asssembly Rule 77.2. | |
2010-07-01 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after July 8 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. | |
2010-07-01 | Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4201.) | |
2010-06-30 | Read second time. To third reading. Ordered to Special Consent Calendar. | |
2010-06-29 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. | |
2010-06-17 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5. | |
2010-06-16 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. | |
2010-06-15 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 10). | |
2010-03-11 | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | |
2010-02-25 | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2010-02-24 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H. | |
2010-02-11 | Referred to Com. on T. & H. | |
2010-01-28 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2010-01-27 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 68. Noes 0. Page 3913.) | |
2010-01-25 | Read second time. To Consent Calendar. | |
2010-01-21 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (January 21). | |
2010-01-12 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (January 11). | |
2010-01-04 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. | |
2009-04-27 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2009-04-02 | Referred to Com. on TRANS. | |
2009-03-02 | Read first time. | |
2009-03-01 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 30. | |
2009-02-27 | Introduced. To print. |