CA AB15 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on September 23 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-23 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 23 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-23 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1016.5 of the Penal Code, relating to criminal procedure.
Title
Criminal procedure: pleas.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-08-25 - Assembly - AB 15 FUENTES Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 57 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2010-08-24 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB15 Fuentes By Leno (Y: 21 N: 13 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2010-06-15 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-08-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-08-17 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-07-08 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-01 - Assembly - AB 15 FUENTES Third Reading Urgency (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-01 - Assembly - Amend, and do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Revenue and Taxation with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-24 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB15 Fuentes By Leno (Y: 21 N: 13 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2010-06-15 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-08-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-08-17 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-07-08 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-01 - Assembly - AB 15 FUENTES Third Reading Urgency (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-01 - Assembly - Amend, and do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Revenue and Taxation with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-09-23 | Vetoed by Governor. | |
2010-09-03 | Enrolled and to the Governor at 3 p.m. | |
2010-08-25 | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 49. Noes 27. Page 6645.) Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 57. Noes 17. Page 6645.) | |
2010-08-24 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 26 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. | |
2010-08-24 | Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 21. Noes 13. Page 4826.) | |
2010-07-15 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2010-07-01 | Read third time, amended. To second reading. | |
2010-06-16 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2010-06-15 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 15). | |
2010-06-09 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |
2010-06-03 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |
2010-05-20 | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |
2010-05-13 | Read second time. To third reading. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c). | |
2010-05-12 | Read third time, amended. To second reading. | |
2009-09-08 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2009-09-04 | Read third time, amended. To second reading. | |
2009-09-02 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. | |
2009-09-01 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 3.) (August 27). | |
2009-08-17 | In committee: Placed on Appropriations suspense file. | |
2009-07-23 | Joint Rule 62(a) suspended. (Page 1804.) In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2009-07-09 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (July 8). | |
2009-06-24 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2009-06-11 | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. | |
2009-06-02 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2009-06-01 | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed and to Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 1823.) | |
2009-05-29 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 28). Read second time. To third reading. | |
2009-05-28 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2009-05-26 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2009-05-21 | Read second time and amended. | |
2009-05-20 | From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 18). | |
2009-05-19 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to REV. & TAX. suspense file. | |
2009-05-11 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2009-04-13 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. | |
2009-04-02 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 1). | |
2009-03-26 | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. | |
2009-03-25 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended. | |
2009-03-02 | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. | |
2009-02-26 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended. | |
2009-02-10 | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. by unanimous consent, and then be re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. | |
2009-02-05 | Referred to Coms. on REV. & TAX. and L. GOV. | |
2008-12-02 | From printer. May be heard in committee January 1. | |
2008-12-01 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 1016.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |