CA AB1487 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-03 - Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on October 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-03 - Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Article 17 (commencing with Section 6250) to Chapter 4 of Division 3 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to legal assistance.
Title
Legal Services Trust Fund Commission: Homelessness Prevention Fund: grants: eviction or displacement.
Sponsors
Asm. David Chiu [D] | Asm. Jesse Gabriel [D] | Asm. Miguel Santiago [D] | Sen. Benjamin Allen [D] |
Sen. Maria Durazo [D] | Asm. Ash Kalra [D] | Asm. Alex Lee [D] | Sen. Nancy Skinner [D] |
Asm. Buffy Wicks [D] | Sen. Scott Wiener [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-09-09 - Assembly - AB 1487 Gabriel Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 59 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-09-08 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1487 Gabriel et al. By Allen (Y: 29 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-07-06 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - Assembly - AB 1487 Gabriel Assembly Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 17 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-08 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1487 Gabriel et al. By Allen (Y: 29 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-07-06 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - Assembly - AB 1487 Gabriel Assembly Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 17 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-03 | Assembly | Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file. |
2022-01-03 | Assembly | Consideration of Governor's veto pending. |
2021-10-08 | Assembly | Vetoed by Governor. |
2021-09-20 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. | |
2021-09-09 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 59. Noes 17. Page 2980.). |
2021-09-08 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2021-09-08 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 29. Noes 9. Page 2528.). |
2021-09-07 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-09-03 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2021-07-08 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-07-07 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 2.) (July 6). |
2021-06-25 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2021-06-15 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2021-05-28 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2021-05-27 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 58. Noes 17. Page 1582.) |
2021-04-12 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-04-08 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2021-04-07 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 2.) (April 6). |
2021-03-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2021-03-18 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. |
2021-03-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2021-02-22 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2021-02-20 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. |
2021-02-19 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 6250 | New Code | See Bill Text |