CA AB1475 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-15 - From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R.
Pending: Senate Budget and Fiscal Review Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-15 - From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R.
Pending: Senate Budget and Fiscal Review Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 73 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.
Title
Property taxes: new construction exclusion: active solar energy system.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-23 - Assembly - AB 1475 BUDGET Assembly Third Reading By SKINNER (Y: 53 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-15 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2014-06-09 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Ayes 24. Noes 12. Page 3784.) |
2014-06-05 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2014-05-23 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2014-05-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 53. Noes 21. Page 5076.) |
2014-05-08 | Assembly | Without reference to committee. Ordered to second reading. Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 51. Noes 19. Page 4818.) Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-01-10 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 9. |
2014-01-09 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Revenue and Taxation Code | 73 | Amended Code | Citation Text |