CA AB1473 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-09-01 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-09-01 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Sections 33549 and 33549.5 to the Education Code, relating to pupil instruction.
Title
School curriculum: health framework: physical education framework: compression-only cardiopulmonary resuscitation: automated external defibrillators.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-07-03 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-21 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-25 - Assembly - AB 1473 Maienschein Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-21 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-25 - Assembly - AB 1473 Maienschein Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-09-01 | Senate | In committee: Held under submission. |
2023-07-03 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR suspense file. |
2023-06-21 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-06-07 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2023-05-26 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2023-05-25 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 1. Page 1784.) |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 18). |
2023-05-10 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2023-05-02 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-05-01 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2023-04-27 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 26). |
2023-03-27 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2023-03-23 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. |
2023-03-23 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2023-02-18 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. |
2023-02-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 33549 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Education Code | 33549.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |