CA AB1470 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-26 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Corbett.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-26 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Corbett.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend the Budget Act of 2013 (Chapters 20 and 354 of the Statutes of 2013) by augmenting Item 9840-001-0001 of Section 2.00 of that act, relating to the state budget, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, budget bill.
Title
Budget Act of 2013: augmentation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-15 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Assembly - AB 1470 BUDGET Assembly Third Reading By SKINNER (Y: 53 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Assembly - AB 1470 BUDGET Assembly Third Reading By SKINNER (Y: 53 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-26 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Corbett. |
2014-06-15 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 15). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-06-12 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2014-06-09 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Ayes 24. Noes 12. Page 3784.) |
2014-06-05 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2014-05-23 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2014-05-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 53. Noes 21. Page 5074.) |
2014-05-08 | Assembly | Without reference to committee. Ordered to second reading. Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 51. Noes 19. Page 4818.) Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-01-10 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 9. |
2014-01-09 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |