CA AB1467 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 24, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 24, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Article 2.6 (commencing with Section 124238) to Chapter 4 of Part 2 of Division 106 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to youth health.
Title
Nevaeh Youth Sports Safety Act.
Sponsors
Asm. Juan Alanis [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-06-15 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB1467 Alanis (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-07 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-30 - Assembly - AB 1467 Alanis Consent Calendar Second Day (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2023-03-21 - Assembly - Do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-06-07 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-30 - Assembly - AB 1467 Alanis Consent Calendar Second Day (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2023-03-21 - Assembly - Do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-29 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 24, Statutes of 2023. | |
2023-06-29 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2023-06-23 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. | |
2023-06-15 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2023-06-15 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1575.). |
2023-06-08 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2023-06-07 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 7). |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2023-03-30 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2023-03-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 65. Noes 0. Page 1008.) |
2023-03-23 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2023-03-22 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2023-03-21 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (March 21). |
2023-03-09 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on A., E., S., & T. |
2023-02-18 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. |
2023-02-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 124238 | New Code | See Bill Text |