CA AB1467 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 556, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 556, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 67385 of, and to add Section 89033 to, the Education Code, relating to student safety.
Title
Student safety: sexual assault and domestic violence procedures and protocols: sexual assault and domestic violence counselors.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-08-30 - Assembly - AB 1467 Cervantes Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1467 Cervantes By Gonzalez (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - Assembly - AB 1467 Cervantes Assembly Third Reading (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1467 Cervantes By Gonzalez (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - Assembly - AB 1467 Cervantes Assembly Third Reading (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-27 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 556, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-09-27 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-09-12 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2022-08-30 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0.). |
2022-08-29 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2022-08-29 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5179.). |
2022-08-17 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-16 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2022-06-29 | Senate | Ordered to third reading. |
2022-06-29 | Senate | From Consent Calendar. |
2022-06-28 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2022-06-27 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2022-06-16 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-15 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 14). |
2022-06-01 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 1). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2022-05-04 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on ED. and JUD. |
2022-02-01 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2022-01-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 3428.) |
2022-01-24 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-01-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (January 20). |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2021-05-12 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2021-04-29 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-04-28 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2021-04-27 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 27). |
2021-04-22 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2021-04-19 | Assembly | (pending re-refer to Com. on JUD.) |
2021-04-19 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 56 suspended. (Page 1059.) |
2021-04-08 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2021-03-26 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2021-03-25 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on HIGHER ED. and JUD. |
2021-03-22 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended. |
2021-02-22 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2021-02-20 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. |
2021-02-19 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 67385 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 89033 | New Code | See Bill Text |