CA AB1458 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-01 - Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 53. Noes 17. Page 2082.).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-01 - Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 53. Noes 17. Page 2082.).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 84616 to the Government Code, relating to the Political Reform Act of 1974.
Title
Political Reform Act of 1974: Secretary of State: online filing and disclosure system.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-01 - Assembly - AB 1458 FRIEDMAN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 17 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-01 | Assembly | Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 53. Noes 17. Page 2082.). |
2017-05-11 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 10). |
2017-04-26 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2017-04-19 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-04-18 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2017-04-17 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (April 5). |
2017-03-13 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on E. & R. |
2017-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2017-02-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 84616 | New Code | See Bill Text |