CA AB1452 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 635, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 635, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 22511 of the Vehicle Code, relating to vehicles.
Title
Parking: exclusive electric charging and parking on public streets.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-09-05 - Assembly - AB 1452 MURATSUCHI Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 48 N: 29 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-31 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1452 Muratsuchi By Allen (Y: 26 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - Assembly - AB 1452 MURATSUCHI Assembly Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 22 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-31 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1452 Muratsuchi By Allen (Y: 26 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - Assembly - AB 1452 MURATSUCHI Assembly Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 22 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-10 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 635, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-10-10 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-09-12 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m. |
2017-09-05 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 48. Noes 29. Page 2936.). |
2017-08-31 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 2 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2017-08-31 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 26. Noes 12. Page 2307.). |
2017-07-18 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-07-17 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2017-06-27 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-06-26 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2017-06-13 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 3.) (June 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2017-05-01 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-05-01 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 51. Noes 22. Page 1307.) |
2017-04-27 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-04-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (April 26). |
2017-03-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 4.) (March 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-03-16 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2017-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2017-02-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Vehicle Code | 22511 | Amended Code | Citation Text |