CA AB145 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-16 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 80, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-16 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 80, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 12838.4 of the Government Code, to amend Sections 851.93, 1203.425, 1233.3, 1233.4, 1233.6, 1233.61, 3042, 5007.3, 5075, 5075.6, 5076.1, 5076.2, 5076.3, 6031, 6258.1, 9001, 13602, 13603, and 13823.95, of, to amend and repeal Section 4530.5 of, to add Sections 1170.01, 2042.1, and 3041.6 to, to add and repeal Section 1233.11 of, and to repeal Article 4 (commencing with Section 2035) of Chapter 1 of Title 1 of Part 3 of, the Penal Code, and to amend Sections 209 and 730 of, and to add Section 1760.45 to, the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to public safety, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.
Title
Public safety.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-07-01 - Assembly - AB 145 BUDGET Concurrence in Senate Amendments By TING (Y: 55 N: 7 NV: 17 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-01 - Senate - Assembly 2nd Reading AB145 BUDGET (Ting) By Skinner (Y: 30 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Assembly - AB 145 BUDGET Assembly Third Reading By TING (Y: 56 N: 18 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-01 - Senate - Assembly 2nd Reading AB145 BUDGET (Ting) By Skinner (Y: 30 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Assembly - AB 145 BUDGET Assembly Third Reading By TING (Y: 56 N: 18 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-16 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 80, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-07-16 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2021-07-05 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. | |
2021-07-01 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 55. Noes 7. Page 2201.). |
2021-07-01 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 57. Noes 19. Page 2195.) |
2021-07-01 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 57. Noes 19. Page 2195.) |
2021-07-01 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after July 3 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2021-07-01 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 29. Noes 10. Page 1758.). |
2021-07-01 | Senate | Senate Rule 29 suspended. (Ayes 31. Noes 9. Page 1750.) |
2021-07-01 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-06-30 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 4.) (June 30). |
2021-06-28 | Senate | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Ayes 31. Noes 9. Page 1658.) |
2021-06-28 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2021-06-27 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Ayes 29. Noes 9. Page 1627.) |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2021-02-25 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2021-02-25 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 56. Noes 18. Page 484.) |
2021-02-23 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-02-22 | Assembly | Ordered to second reading. |
2021-02-22 | Assembly | Withdrawn from committee. |
2021-02-22 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 17. Page 432.) |
2021-02-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2021-02-18 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on BUDGET. Read second time and amended. |
2021-01-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2021-01-11 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2021-01-09 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 9. |
2021-01-08 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |