CA AB145 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 28 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-08-30 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 28 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-08-30 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Sections 116271, 116272, 116272.5, and 116760.25 to the Health and Safety Code, relating to drinking water.
Title
State Water Resources Control Board: drinking water.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-08-12 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-07-03 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-12 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Health (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-28 - Assembly - AB 145 PEREA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2013-05-24 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-30 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-02 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Environmental Safety and Toxic Materials (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-07-03 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-12 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Health (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-28 - Assembly - AB 145 PEREA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2013-05-24 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-30 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-02 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Environmental Safety and Toxic Materials (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-08-30 | Senate | In committee: Held under submission. |
2013-08-12 | Senate | In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2013-07-08 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (July 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-06-20 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2013-06-18 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2013-06-17 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 12). |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on E.Q. and HEALTH. |
2013-05-28 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2013-05-28 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 50. Noes 25. Page 1662.) |
2013-05-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 1.) (May 24). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-05-15 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2013-05-01 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-04-25 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. |
2013-04-24 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Read second time and amended. |
2013-04-02 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. (Ayes 9. Noes 2.) (April 2). Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. |
2013-01-31 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on W.,P. & W. and E.S. & T.M. |
2013-01-22 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 21. |
2013-01-18 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |