CA AB1447 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-01-14 - Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on October 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-01-14 - Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 8543.8 to the Government Code, and to amend Section 11771.5 of the Insurance Code, relating to the State Compensation Insurance Fund.
Title
State Compensation Insurance Fund: audits.
Sponsors
Asm. John Perez [D] |
Roll Calls
2009-08-31 - Assembly - AB 1447 PEREZ, J. Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-08-24 - Senate - Special Consent #15 AB1447 John A. Perez By Calderon (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-07-08 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-17 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Governmental Organization (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-14 - Assembly - AB 1447 PEREZ, J. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-06 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-08-24 - Senate - Special Consent #15 AB1447 John A. Perez By Calderon (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-07-08 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-17 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Governmental Organization (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-14 - Assembly - AB 1447 PEREZ, J. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-06 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-01-14 | Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file. | |
2009-10-26 | Consideration of Governor's veto pending. | |
2009-10-11 | Vetoed by Governor. | |
2009-09-08 | Enrolled and to the Governor at 4:15 p.m. | |
2009-08-31 | Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2786.) | |
2009-08-25 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 27 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. | |
2009-08-24 | Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1926.) | |
2009-08-20 | Ordered to Special Consent Calendar. | |
2009-08-17 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2009-07-23 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. | |
2009-07-08 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 8). | |
2009-06-18 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on G.O. Re-referred. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 17). | |
2009-06-04 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., F. & I. | |
2009-05-21 | Referred to Coms. on B., F. & I. and G.O. | |
2009-05-14 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2009-05-14 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 1470.) | |
2009-05-11 | Read second time. To Consent Calendar. | |
2009-05-07 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (May 6). | |
2009-04-22 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 22). | |
2009-04-13 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P.E.,R. & S.S. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on P.E.,R. & S.S. Re-referred to Com. on INS. by unanimous consent. | |
2009-04-02 | Referred to Com. on P.E.,R. & S.S. | |
2009-03-02 | Read first time. | |
2009-03-01 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 30. | |
2009-02-27 | Introduced. To print. |