CA AB1446 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 11 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-09-05 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Monning.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 11 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-09-05 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Monning.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 367 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to dependent children.
Title
Dependent children: periodic review hearing.
Sponsors
Asm. Ken Cooley [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-09-01 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-21 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Rules] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Judiciary] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - Assembly - AB 1446 COOLEY Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-21 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Rules] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Judiciary] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - Assembly - AB 1446 COOLEY Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-05 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Monning. |
2017-09-05 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-09-01 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2017-09-01 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (September 1). |
2017-08-21 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2017-07-12 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-07-05 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2017-07-03 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on RLS. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 27). |
2017-06-15 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2017-06-14 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 13). |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on HUMAN S. and JUD. |
2017-05-11 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-05-11 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1472.) |
2017-05-02 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-01 | Assembly | Ordered to second reading. |
2017-05-01 | Assembly | Withdrawn from committee. |
2017-04-19 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-04-18 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2017-04-17 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 4). |
2017-03-13 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2017-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2017-02-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 367 | Amended Code | Citation Text |